+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 18, 2007, 12:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Pensions, Veteran Affairs & General Law
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 136 NOES: 18
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor