+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Higher Education
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor