+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on General Laws
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time