+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Health and Pensions
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee: Children and Families
- Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor