+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 129 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 4
- House Adopts - SS as amended. AYES: 105 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 4
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Dissolved
- Taken Up
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- House Message
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
On May 10, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- House Message
- Taken Up
- House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - HOSKINS, BURLISON, KOENIG, ROBERTS, RAZER
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Reported to the House with... - SS, as amended
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9, and SA 11, adopted. AYES: 27 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Friday, May 6, 2022, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
- SS Adopted - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9, and SA 11, adopted.
- SS Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 12, 2022, 10:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 136 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - Consent - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Consent and House Procedure
- Reported Do Pass - Consent - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Pensions
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (19)
5038S04.31S
Withdrawn
5038S04.27S
Moot
5038S04.29S
Defeated
5038S04.30S
Withdrawn
5038S04.01S
Withdrawn
5038S04.16S
Adopted
5038S04.24S
Moot
5038S04.14S
Adopted
5038S04.15S
Withdrawn
5038S04.18S
Adopted
5038S04.17S
Adopted
5038S04.11S
Adopted
5038S04.05S
Adopted
5038S04.09S
Adopted
8072S22.01S
Adopted
5038S04.04S
Adopted
5038S04.03S
Adopted
5038S.04F
Adopted, as amended
5038S04.01F
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor