+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 8, 2019, 12:00pm, Bingham Conference Room
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred: Fiscal Oversight
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 17, 2019, 8 a.m., Senate Lounge
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 10, 2019, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Seniors, Families and Children
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Aging
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled