+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Monday, April 11, 2016, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Banking
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
5964H01.02H
Distributed
+ − Vote
March 17, 2016: HB 2397
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor