+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 16, 2008 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Bill Reconsidered
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Healthcare Transformation
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 10, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time