+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On March 10, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor