+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
- Reported Do Pass
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Friday, May 11, 2018, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
- Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 25, 2018, 9:07am, Bingham Conference Room
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 18, 2018, 10:01am, SCR 1
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Insurance and Banking
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 121 NOES: 29 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- HCS Adopted
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Insurance Policy
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
6277H02.01H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor