+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
- Public Hearing Held
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 27, 2016, noon or upon morning recess whichever comes later, SCR 1
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Perfected
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Agriculture Policy
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
6099H01.01H
Distributed
6099H01.02H
Distributed