+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor