+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Education
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 116 NOES: 17 PRESENT: 0
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 and HA 2 adopted
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Rules - HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on Rules
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Continued
- Action Postponed
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2016: HB 2327
April 20, 2016: HB 2327 (HA 1)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor