+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Commerce
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
5971H02.04H
Distributed
5971H02.05H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor