+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 24 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Agriculture Policy
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor