+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor