+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules - May 9, 2019
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 12, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor