+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled