+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 30, 2005 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 126 NOES: 22
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent
On February 28, 2005 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent - NO TIME LIMIT FOR DEBATE
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS BY CONSENT
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Senior Citizen Advocacy
On January 18, 2005 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 13, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor