+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Thursday, April 26, 2018, 9:15am, SCR 2
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 120 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
6166H01.01H
Adopted
6166H01.02H
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor