+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time