+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor