+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time