+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SS/sa 1 pending
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 18, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred: Fiscal Oversight
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 10, 2019, 11:30am, Bingham Conference Room
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 2, 2019, 12:15pm, Senate Lounge
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Education
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - HCA 2 adopted AYES: 101 NOES: 49 PRESENT: 2
- Taken Up
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 2 AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session Continued
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
- Action Postponed
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Workforce Development
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 11, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (8)
0820S.05F
Offered
0820S05.03S
Offered
0820H02.07H
Committee
0820H02.05H
Distributed
0820H02.04H
Distributed
0820H02.03H
Adopted
0820H02.02H
Distributed
0820H02.01H
Distributed