+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time