+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor