+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Third Read and Defeated - AYES: 39 NOES: 111 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Perfected
- Taken Up
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 7 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
4338H01.04H
Defeated
4338H01.03H
Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
April 14, 2016: HB 2242
April 4, 2016: HB 2242 (*HA 1)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor