+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 1, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed Back on Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 16 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor