+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On July 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- SCS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 32
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 32
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
- Taken Up
- House Adopts - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 137 NOES: 12
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 136 NOES: 12
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 138 NOES: 9
- House Message
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
- Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 1, 2014, 9:45AM, PERSHING CONFERENCE ROOM
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
- Public Hearing Scheduled
- Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 30, 2014, 1:45pm, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 13
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 136 NOES: 14
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - ha 1 adopted
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Referred: General Laws
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time