+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor