+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Reported Do Pass
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, February 9, 2016, 9:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 157 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Perfected with Amendments - HCA 1, HA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 154 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Laid Over
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
5844H03.03H
Distributed
5844H03.01H
Distributed