+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Not Pass
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Do Pass Failed
- Executive Session Completed
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Insurance
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Health Insurance
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
5712H01.01H
Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor