+ − Actions (27)
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On April 23, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On April 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On April 23, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 17, 2003 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 15
- House Concurs - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 142 NOES: 14
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS AMENDED
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On March 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 3, 2003 in the House:
- Second Rd/Refer: Fin & Govt Org, Vet Affairs & Elections
On February 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Defeated - AYES: 97 NOES: 58
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 128 NOES: 28
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Referred: Financial Services
On January 22, 2003 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor