+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 13, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State - THIS BILL BECOMES EFFECTIVE JAN 1, 2008, EXCEPT FOR SEC 385.202,385.206,385.214,385.216,385.218 385.220,385.308,385.314,385.316,385.318, AND 385.320 WHICH HAVE AN AUG 28, 2007 EFFECTIVE DATE
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 1
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 3, 2007, 12:00PM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Small Business, Insurance & Indust Rel
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 0
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Insurance Policy
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 2, 2007 in the House:
- Prefiled