+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 24, 2010 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 25, 2010 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 25, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On April 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 7, 2010, 12:00P.M., SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
- Second Read and Referred: Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources
On March 31, 2010 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Agri-Business
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor