+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Taken Up
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 2, SSA 1 for SA 2, SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 2 adopted, SSA 1 for SA 2 as amended adopted, SA 5, SA 1 to SA 5 to SS#2 offered
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 adopted/SS#2 for SCS pending
- Senate Substitute Offered
- SS Withdrawn
- Taken Up
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SSA 1 for SA 2, SA 3, SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 4, SSA 1 for SA 4 as amended adopted
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, February 2, 2016, 9:00am, Senate Lounge.
- Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - HPA 1 ADOPTED
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HCA 1 AS AMENDED, HA 1 TO HA 1, HA 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED
- Taken Up for Perfection
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Laid Over
- Taken Up for Perfection
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 TO HCA 1, HCA 1 AS AMENDED AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability
- Read Second Time
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (15)
5765H01.24H
Adopted
5765H01.18H
Distributed
5765H01.22H
Distributed
5765H01.21H
Distributed
5765H01.10H
Distributed
5765H01.11H
Distributed
5765H01.14H
Distributed
5765H01.15H
Distributed
5765H01.07H
Distributed
5765H01.04H
Distributed
5765H01.08H
Distributed
5765H01.09H
Distributed
5765H01.05H
Distributed
5765H01.03H
Distributed
5765H01.01H
Distributed