+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 19, 2022, 2:30 p.m., Senate Lounge.
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: General Laws
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 145 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 15 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor