+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 12, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 154 NOES: 0
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 153 NOES: 0
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- SCS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 11, 2011, UPON ADJOURNMENT, SENATE LOUNGE
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 155 NOES: 0
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 1 TO HA 2, HA 2 AS AMENDED ADOPTED
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor