+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 12, 2014, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - AMENDED, NOTE ROOM CHANGE, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
- Public Hearing Held
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Monday, May 5, 2014, upon evening recess or adjournment, Senate Lounge
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 122 NOES: 30
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Perfected - AYES: 126 NOES: 26
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Referred: General Laws
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor