+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 30, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor