+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 20, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 10, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues
On March 31, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor