+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On May 1, 2012 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Downsizing State Government
On April 2, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time