+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - Consent - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Consent and House Procedure
- Reported Do Pass - Consent - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor