+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (51)
On July 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- House Message
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2 and SA 3, adopted. AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On May 6, 2022 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS, as amended
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
- Laid Over
- Taken Up
- House Adopts - SCS, as amended AYES: 103 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 13
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 104 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 12
- Executive Session Completed
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
- SCS Adopted - SA 1, SA 2 and SA 3, adopted.
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- SCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Monday, April 25, 2022, 3:30 p.m., Senate Lounge.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 134 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Workforce Development
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 28, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (5)
4855S02.05S
Adopted
4855S02.06S
Adopted
4855S02.04S
Adopted
4855S02.03S
Adopted, as amended
4855S02.01F
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor