+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 11, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
0259H02.01L
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor