+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Delivered to Governor
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 110 NOES: 45
- House Concurs - SS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 109 NOES: 45
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- SS Withdrawn
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS PENDING
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED YEAS: 24 NAYS: 7
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 6, 2011, 12:00PM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 109 NOES: 43
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Laid Over
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Agri-Business
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (61)
Type:
Primary Sponsor