+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 1, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Bill Reconsidered
- Executive Session Completed
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Motion to Do Pass Failed
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Government Oversight
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (5)
4713H04.29H
Distributed
4713H04.28H
Distributed
4713H04.13H
Distributed
4713H04.12H
Distributed
4713H04.09H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor