+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - AMENDED, NOTE ROOM CHANGE, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
- Executive Session Scheduled - AMENDED, NOTE ROOM CHANGE, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Monday, May 5, 2014, upon evening recess or adjournment, Senate Lounge
- Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 5, 2014, upon evening recess or adjournment, Senate Lounge
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor