+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Utilities
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor