+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Returned to Committee of Origin
- Removed from Consent Calendar
On April 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 14, 2008, 2:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 2
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 25, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Bill Reconsidered
- Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Spec Com on Professional Registration & Licens
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor